10/11/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 347, Statutes of 2009. | |||
10/11/2009 | Approved by Governor. | |||
09/11/2009 | Enrolled. To Governor at 9 p.m. | |||
09/04/2009 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
09/03/2009 | Read third time. Passed. To Senate. | |||
06/24/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
06/23/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (Heard in committee on June 23.) | |||
05/11/2009 | To Com. on JUD. | |||
04/20/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
04/20/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 15. Page 542.) To Assembly. | |||
03/31/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 383.) | |||
03/17/2009 | Set for hearing March 31. | |||
02/25/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | |||
02/24/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |