02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/28/2009 | Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/28/2009 | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 1036.) Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |||
05/26/2009 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
05/19/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Set for hearing May 26. | |||
05/14/2009 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
05/08/2009 | Set for hearing May 18. | |||
05/05/2009 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/04/2009 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 588.) | |||
04/13/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Set for hearing April 21. | |||
03/24/2009 | Set for hearing April 14. | |||
03/09/2009 | To Com. on PUB. S. | |||
02/26/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | |||
02/25/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |