|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 695, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4678.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 6335.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 2. Page 6336.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6297.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 22.)
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. On B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 43. Noes 28. Page 3042.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
From inactive file to third reading file.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Krekorian.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Krekorian.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 15.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
To Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 825.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 806.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
To Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|