02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/20/2009 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 4. Page 992.) Reconsideration granted. | |||
05/13/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. Set for hearing May 20. | |||
04/27/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. | |||
04/20/2009 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/24/2009 | Set for hearing April 20. | |||
03/09/2009 | To Com. on EQ. | |||
02/26/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | |||
02/25/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |