LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB296
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB296
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB296
Compare Versions
SB296 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB296 Enrolled September 4, 2009
SB296 Amended August 17, 2009
SB296 Amended July 14, 2009
SB296 Amended June 30, 2009
SB296 Amended April 13, 2009
SB296 Introduced February 25, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB296 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB296 Enrolled September 4, 2009
SB296 Amended August 17, 2009
SB296 Amended July 14, 2009
SB296 Amended June 30, 2009
SB296 Amended April 13, 2009
SB296 Introduced February 25, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare