02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/13/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/28/2009 | Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/22/2009 | Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |||
05/18/2009 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
05/08/2009 | Set for hearing May 18. | |||
04/29/2009 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 702.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/17/2009 | Set for hearing April 29. | |||
04/16/2009 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
03/24/2009 | Set for hearing April 22. | |||
01/29/2009 | To Com. on L. & I.R. | |||
12/02/2008 | From print. May be acted upon on or after January 1. | |||
12/01/2008 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |