|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 576, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 2288.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 14. Page 2853.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 50. Noes 28. Page 2672.) To third reading. (Corrected August 24.)
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on July 15.)
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (Heard in committee on July 6.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
To Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 12. Page 1037.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 4. Page 948.)
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1. Page 681.)
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
To Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|