|
08/06/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 43, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/27/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1766.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2390.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
To Coms. on B. & F. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 622.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 497.)
|
|
|
|
04/03/2009
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 396.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2009
|
Set for hearing April 1.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
To Coms. on B., F. & I. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|