08/27/2009 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. Held in committee and under submission. | |||
08/24/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
08/19/2009 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on August 19.) | |||
06/30/2009 | To Com. on ED. | |||
06/24/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
06/24/2009 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1427.) To Assembly. | |||
06/18/2009 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |||
06/17/2009 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1338.) | |||
06/02/2009 | Set for hearing June 17. | |||
05/26/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
04/27/2009 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/01/2009 | Set for hearing April 29. | |||
02/26/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | |||
02/25/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |