|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 348, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Senate. Ordered held in Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1924.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2617.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 15.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on B. & P. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. (Heard in committee on June 23.)
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
To Coms. on JUD. and B. & P.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 623.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 383.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2009
|
Set for hearing March 31.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
To Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|