|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 577, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 2269.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. To Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (Heard in committee on July 7.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
To Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 1142.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 5. Page 1025.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
Set for hearing May 26. (For vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 678.)
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
To Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|