California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB312 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 10/11/2009

 BILL NUMBER: SB 312CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 179 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE OCTOBER 11, 2009 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR OCTOBER 11, 2009 PASSED THE SENATE SEPTEMBER 2, 2009 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 27, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JULY 9, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 26, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 28, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senator Romero (Coauthors: Senators Alquist, Denham, Florez, Hancock, and Runner) FEBRUARY 25, 2009 An act to add Section 33009.7 to the Education Code, and to add Section 15491 to the Government Code, relating to public meetings and hearings. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 312, Romero. Public meetings and hearings. Existing law establishes the State Board of Education for the purpose of, among other things, studying the educational conditions and needs of the state and making plans for the improvement of the administration and efficiency of the public schools of the state. Existing law requires that the State Board of Education adhere to specified requirements relating to meetings and hearings. Existing law establishes the State Allocation Board, consisting of specified members and charged with specified duties, including, but not limited to, determining how bond funds are allocated for public school construction and modernization projects. Existing law requires the State Allocation Board to adhere to specified requirements relating to meetings and hearings. This bill would require the State Board of Education and the State Allocation Board to provide for live video and audio transmission of all meetings and hearings that are open to the public through a technology that is accessible to as large a segment of the public as possible. The technologies to be used would include, but not be limited to, cable, satellite, over-the-air, or any other type of transmission that can be accessed through a television, and Web cast. The State Board of Education and the State Allocation Board would be required to ensure that any Web cast transmission implemented pursuant to these provisions be transmitted over and accessed through the K-12 High-Speed Network. The State Board of Education and the State Allocation Board also would be required to consult with the State Chief Information Officer for the purposes of implementing the provisions of the bill. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 33009.7 is added to the Education Code, to read: 33009.7. (a) The state board shall provide for live video and audio transmission of all board meetings and hearings that are open to the public through a technology that is accessible to as large a segment of the public as possible, including, but not limited to, the use of any of the following technologies: (1) Cable, satellite, over-the-air, or any other type of transmission that can be accessed through a television. (2) Web cast. (b) The state board shall ensure that any Web cast transmission implemented pursuant to subdivision (a) may be transmitted over and accessed through the K-12 High-Speed Network established pursuant to paragraph (2) of subdivision (b) of Section 11800. (c) The state board shall consult with the State Chief Information Officer for the purposes of implementing this section pursuant to the duties that the State Chief Information Officer is required to perform, as described in Section 11545 of the Government Code. SEC. 2. Section 15491 is added to the Government Code, to read: 15491. (a) The State Allocation Board shall provide for live video and audio transmission of all board meetings and hearings that are open to the public through a technology that is accessible to as large a segment of the public as possible, including, but not limited to, the use of any of the following technologies: (1) Cable, satellite, over-the-air, or any other type of transmission that can be accessed through a television. (2) Webcast. (b) The State Allocation Board shall ensure that any Web cast transmission implemented pursuant to subdivision (a) may be transmitted over and accessed through the K-12 High-Speed Network established pursuant to paragraph (2) of subdivision (b) of Section 11800 of the Education Code. (c) The board shall consult with the State Chief Information Officer for the purposes of implementing this section pursuant to the duties that the State Chief Information Officer is required to perform, as described in Section 11545.