|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 578, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Senate. Ordered held in Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
In Senate. To enrollment. (Enrolled measure version corrected August 25.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2669.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
From Consent Calendar to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 8.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
To Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1177.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 1069.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 704.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2009
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|