02/11/2010 | To Com. on HEALTH. | |||
01/28/2010 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
01/28/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 2735.) To Assembly. | |||
01/04/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
12/17/2009 | From inactive file to second reading file. Read second time. Amended. To second reading. | |||
06/03/2009 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 17. Noes 20. Page 1196.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Alquist. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1196.) Placed on inactive file on request of Senator Alquist. | |||
05/28/2009 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 5. Page 1069.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |||
05/22/2009 | Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |||
04/20/2009 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
04/14/2009 | Set for hearing April 20. | |||
04/02/2009 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 4. Page 642.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/24/2009 | Set for hearing April 1. | |||
02/26/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | |||
02/25/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |