08/27/2009 | Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |||
07/01/2009 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
06/23/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. | |||
06/22/2009 | Read second time. Amended. To second reading. | |||
06/18/2009 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on June 16.) | |||
05/28/2009 | To Com. on E.S. & T.M. | |||
05/14/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/14/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 897.) To Assembly. | |||
04/29/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
04/28/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 678.) | |||
04/16/2009 | Set for hearing April 27. | |||
04/13/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on EQ. | |||
04/02/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/09/2009 | To Com. on RLS. | |||
02/26/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | |||
02/25/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |