|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 328, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
In Senate. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2419.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 16. Page 3333.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Com. on U. & C. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Placed on third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 3038.) Re-referred to Com. On U. & C. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on July 8.)
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. (Heard in committee on July 6.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
To Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1184.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 1067.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 583.)
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
01/29/2009
|
To Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
|
12/03/2008
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after January 2.
|
|
|
|
12/02/2008
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|