|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 580, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 9 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2130.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2763.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 19.)
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 7.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on E. & R. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. (Heard in committee on July 1.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
To Coms. on L. GOV. and E. & R.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1011.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 703.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Received by Desk on May 1 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(a)(2).)
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
To Com. on L. GOV. Set for hearing April 1.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|