|
08/27/2009
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (Heard in committee on July 6.)
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
To Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 1178.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 5. Page 1070.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2009
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 638.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2009
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|