10/11/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 581, Statutes of 2009. | |||
10/11/2009 | Approved by Governor. | |||
09/28/2009 | Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m. | |||
09/11/2009 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2405.) To enrollment. | |||
06/25/2009 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |||
06/25/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 2259.) To Senate. | |||
06/17/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
06/16/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 16.) | |||
06/11/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
05/11/2009 | To Com. on PUB. S. | |||
04/20/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
04/20/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 543.) To Assembly. | |||
04/15/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 480.) | |||
03/26/2009 | Set for hearing April 14. | |||
02/26/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | |||
02/25/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |