|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 582, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Senate. Ordered held in Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1841.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2483.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 1.)
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 16.)
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
To Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 929.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 848.)
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2009
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 588.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|