06/25/2009 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/22/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |||
06/18/2009 | To Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D. | |||
06/01/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
06/01/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1093.) To Assembly. | |||
05/28/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/27/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 1026.) | |||
05/20/2009 | Set for hearing May 26. (For vote only.) | |||
05/18/2009 | Set, second hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. | |||
05/08/2009 | Set for hearing May 18. | |||
05/01/2009 | Set for hearing May 11. | |||
04/29/2009 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 707.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/16/2009 | Set for hearing April 28. | |||
04/13/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
03/09/2009 | To Com. on T. & H. | |||
02/26/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | |||
02/25/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |