|
01/19/2010
|
Stricken from Senate file.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 9 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 43. Noes 29. Page 2945.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 19.)
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 7.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
To Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 888.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2009
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 587.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 382.) Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
Set for hearing March 31.
|
|
|
|
01/29/2009
|
To Coms. on E., R. & C.A. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
12/10/2008
|
Read first time. From print. May be acted upon on or after January 9.
|
|
|
|
12/09/2008
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|