|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 583, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Senate. Ordered held in Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1924.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 2610.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 8.)
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
To Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 825.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 684.)
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2009
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
To Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|