02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
04/16/2009 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/14/2009 | Set for hearing April 29. | |||
04/13/2009 | Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and REV. & TAX. | |||
04/01/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/09/2009 | To Com. on RLS. | |||
02/26/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | |||
02/25/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |