|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 584, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2023.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2707.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 2669.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From Consent Calendar to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 1.)
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
To Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 931.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading. To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 874.)
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Set for hearing May 5.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
To Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|