|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 160, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 39. Noes 1. Page 2283.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 3. Page 2935.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 7.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. (Heard in committee on June 29.) From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. (Corrected June 25.)
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
To Coms. on B. & F. and B. & P.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 1097.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 1067.) Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 806.)
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 396.) Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2009
|
Set for hearing April 1.
|
|
|
|
01/29/2009
|
To Coms. on B., F. & I. and B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
12/19/2008
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after January 18.
|
|
|
|
12/18/2008
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|