|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 351, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 9 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2130.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2760.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 19.)
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on V.A. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on V.A. (Heard in committee on June 23.)
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
To Coms. on HIGHER ED. and V.A.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1012.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 726.)
|
|
|
|
04/17/2009
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on ED. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 499.) Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
To Coms. on V.A. and ED.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|