|
08/02/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on AGRI. and RULES. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. (Heard in committee on June 10.)
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RULES.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
To Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 1143.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 1036.) Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 5. Page 1070.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2009
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 582.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
To Com. on F. & A.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|