|
11/02/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 641, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
11/02/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
10/20/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 2:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
10/14/2009
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2523.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Urgency clause refused adoption. Senate refuses to concur in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 23. Noes 0. Page 2342.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Negrete McLeod. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2343.)
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2353.)
|
|
|
|
09/05/2009
|
Set for hearing September 8.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10 be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2227.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2887.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 2824.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
From Consent Calendar to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 9.)
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
To Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 898.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 808.)
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Set for hearing May 5.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Corrected April 20.)
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|