BILL NUMBER: SB 369CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 47 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 6, 2009 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR AUGUST 5, 2009 PASSED THE SENATE MAY 11, 2009 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY JULY 9, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 28, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 21, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senator Maldonado (Coauthors: Senators Correa and Negrete McLeod) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Bill Berryhill, Gilmore, Jeffries, and Silva) FEBRUARY 25, 2009 An act to amend Section 1831 of the Military and Veterans Code, relating to the POW/MIA Flag. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 369, Maldonado. Prisoner-of-War/Missing-in-Action Flag: state-owned buildings and facilities. Existing law requires the flag of the National League of POW/MIA Families to be flown over specified state buildings where the United States Flag and the California State Flag currently fly on certain dates during business hours, to the extent structurally feasible. This bill would instead require the flag to be flown during business hours at all state-owned buildings and facilities where the United States Flag and the California State Flag fly, as specified. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 1831 of the Military and Veterans Code is amended to read: 1831. (a) So that the people of California will not forget the sacrifices of those members of the United States Armed Forces who, after the termination of hostilities, remain prisoners of war or are missing in action, as well as the sacrifices of missing United States nonmilitary personnel and civilians, the Governor shall annually proclaim the third Friday of September to be known as Prisoner-of-War/Missing-in-Action (POW/MIA) Recognition Day. (b) The flag of the National League of POW/MIA Families (POW/MIA Flag) is a black and white banner symbolizing those members of the United States Armed Forces who are listed as POW or MIA. The flag serves as a powerful reminder to people everywhere of our country's firm resolve to achieve the fullest possible accounting for every member of the United States Armed Forces, and United States nonmilitary personnel and civilians. The flag shall be flown during business hours, at all state-owned buildings or facilities where the United States Flag and the California State Flag fly, if the flag can be attached to existing flagpoles or other existing structures on which the United States Flag or California Flag fly. The state may accept donations of POW/MIA Flags and related materials. (c) The flag shall be flown at the Vietnam Veterans Memorial located on the grounds of the State Capitol whenever the United States Flag is flown at that location. (d) Additionally, the Governor and the Legislature are authorized and requested to issue proclamations calling upon the people, schools, and local governments of California to recognize POW/MIA Recognition Day with appropriate ceremonies and activities.