California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB37 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 10/11/2009

 BILL NUMBER: SB 37CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 329 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE OCTOBER 11, 2009 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR OCTOBER 11, 2009 PASSED THE SENATE SEPTEMBER 2, 2009 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 27, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 25, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 1, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senator Strickland DECEMBER 18, 2008 An act to amend Section 19849.7 of the Government Code, relating to public employees. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 37, Strickland. State employees: statement of deductions. Existing law requires each state agency, at the time of each payment of salary or wages, to furnish each employee, at his or her discretion, an itemized statement in writing or electronically showing all deductions made from his or her salary or wages as required by specified provisions of law. This bill would require that the itemized statement described above be provided electronically to each employee who has authorized the direct deposit by electronic fund transfer of his or her salary or wages, as specified, unless the employee has requested, in writing, to receive a paper version of the statement. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 19849.7 of the Government Code is amended to read: 19849.7. (a) Each state agency shall at the time of each payment of salary or wages, whether by direct deposit by electronic fund transfer pursuant to Sections 12480 and 12481 or otherwise, furnish each employee an itemized statement showing all deductions made from his or her salary or wages as required by Section 226 of the Labor Code. (b) The itemized statement described in subdivision (a) shall be provided electronically to each employee who has authorized the direct deposit by electronic fund transfer of his or her salary or wages pursuant to Section 12480, unless the employee has requested, in writing, to receive a paper version of the statement. (c) The provision of an electronic statement of itemized deductions pursuant to this section shall be contingent upon the funding and implementation of the Controller's "21st Century Project," and provided only to the extent that the project enables the Controller to provide this information electronically.