LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB370
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB370
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB370
Action History
02/01/2010
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
04/21/2009
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 3. Page 582.) Reconsideration granted.
04/02/2009
Set for hearing April 21.
04/01/2009
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A.
03/09/2009
To Com. on E., R. & C.A.
02/26/2009
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
02/25/2009
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.