LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB372
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB372
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB372
Compare Versions
SB372 Enrolled September 15, 2009
SB372 Amended September 4, 2009
SB372 Amended July 14, 2009
SB372 Amended June 23, 2009
SB372 Amended May 28, 2009
SB372 Amended May 6, 2009
SB372 Amended April 20, 2009
SB372 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB372 Enrolled September 15, 2009
SB372 Amended September 4, 2009
SB372 Amended July 14, 2009
SB372 Amended June 23, 2009
SB372 Amended May 28, 2009
SB372 Amended May 6, 2009
SB372 Amended April 20, 2009
SB372 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare