|
08/27/2009
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
To Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 619.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 806.) Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
To Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|