08/27/2009 | Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |||
07/01/2009 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
06/23/2009 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 23.) | |||
06/08/2009 | To Com. on PUB. S. | |||
06/01/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
06/01/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 9. Page 1100.) To Assembly. | |||
05/28/2009 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 1067.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |||
05/22/2009 | Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |||
05/11/2009 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
05/01/2009 | Set for hearing May 11. | |||
04/29/2009 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/24/2009 | Set for hearing May 4. | |||
04/21/2009 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 587.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/24/2009 | Set for hearing April 21. | |||
01/05/2009 | Read first time. | |||
12/24/2008 | From print. May be acted upon on or after January 24. | |||
12/22/2008 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |