|
08/27/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 8.)
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
To Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 2. Page 970.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 608.)
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2009
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|