|
01/19/2010
|
Stricken from Senate file.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 9 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 47. Noes 30. Page 2938.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (Heard in committee on July 6.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
To Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 891.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 754.)
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 582.) Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on F. & A.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
To Coms. on F. & A. and EQ.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|