|
07/07/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
To Coms. on B. & P. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 1178.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 1070.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 705.)
|
|
|
|
04/24/2009
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 580.) Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
To Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|