LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB39
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB39
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB39
Compare Versions
SB39 Chaptered August 6, 2009
SB39 Enrolled July 17, 2009
SB39 Amended June 26, 2009
SB39 Amended May 13, 2009
SB39 Amended April 27, 2009
SB39 Amended February 24, 2009
SB39 Introduced January 6, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB39 Chaptered August 6, 2009
SB39 Enrolled July 17, 2009
SB39 Amended June 26, 2009
SB39 Amended May 13, 2009
SB39 Amended April 27, 2009
SB39 Amended February 24, 2009
SB39 Introduced January 6, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare