|
09/24/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 275, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4893.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 6463.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6500.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6429.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 12.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 21.)
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
To Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2731.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 2693.)
|
|
|
|
01/20/2010
|
Set for hearing January 21. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2009
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 585.)
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
To Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|