|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 585, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 9 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) (Received by Desk on August 28 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(a)(11).) Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 5. Page 2.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
To Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 1109.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 5. Page 948.)
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 678.)
|
|
|
|
04/24/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 7. Noes 4. Page 609.)
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2009
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
To Coms. on T. & H. and EQ.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|