|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 698, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2010
|
To Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Correctly enrolled. Held at Desk pursuant to Joint Rule 57.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5002.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6748.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 15.)
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Heard in committee on June 16.)
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
To Coms. on B. & P. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 929.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 848.)
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 701.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 806.)
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
To Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|