02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/12/2009 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 3. Page 874.) Reconsideration granted. | |||
05/04/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
04/29/2009 | Set for hearing May 12. | |||
04/14/2009 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/03/2009 | Set for hearing April 21. | |||
03/12/2009 | To Com. on JUD. | |||
02/27/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | |||
02/26/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |