|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 586, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 9 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 2214.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 24. Page 2709.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 2674.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on July 8.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
To Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 0. Page 1099.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 5. Page 1070.) Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2009
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 609.)
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2009
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
To Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|