LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB40
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB40
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB40
Compare Versions
SB40 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB40 Enrolled September 2, 2009
SB40 Amended August 17, 2009
SB40 Amended March 31, 2009
SB40 Amended March 9, 2009
SB40 Introduced January 6, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB40 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB40 Enrolled September 2, 2009
SB40 Amended August 17, 2009
SB40 Amended March 31, 2009
SB40 Amended March 9, 2009
SB40 Introduced January 6, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare