|
01/19/2010
|
Stricken from Senate file.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 2468.) Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 2432.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10 be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 2358.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 29. Page 3111.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 2886.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 19.)
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 8.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
To Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 1174.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended. Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8, but first be re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 6. Noes 4. Page 609.)
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
To Coms. on T. & H. and EQ.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|