|
01/19/2010
|
Stricken from Senate file.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
In Senate. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 2432.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on September 11.) Read second time. Amended. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 16. Page 3379.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3302.)
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3056.)
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 3038.) Re-referred to Com. On NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) (Received by Desk on August 28 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(a)(11).) Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 6.)
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
To Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 16. Page 1111.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 5. Page 1071.) Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 638.)
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2009
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
To Coms. on REV. & TAX. and RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|