06/11/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. | |||
06/08/2009 | To Com. on L. & E. | |||
05/21/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/21/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 972.) To Assembly. | |||
05/19/2009 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |||
05/18/2009 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 876.) | |||
04/21/2009 | Set for hearing May 13. | |||
04/14/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | |||
03/12/2009 | To Com. on L. & I.R. | |||
02/27/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | |||
02/26/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |