|
01/19/2010
|
Stricken from Senate file.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
In Senate. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 21. Noes 17. Page 2432.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 47. Noes 31. Page 3341.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 43. Noes 28. Page 3042.) To third reading. (Corrected September 11.)
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 6.) (Heard in committee on July 6.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. (Heard in committee on July 1.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
To Coms. on L. GOV. and TRANS.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 16. Page 1144.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 1036.) Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 5. Page 1071.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 4. Page 707.)
|
|
|
|
04/24/2009
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 498.) Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2009
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
To Coms. on L. GOV. and RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|