|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 182, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2270.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. To Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 2890.)
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 2866.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 19.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 6.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
To Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1102.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 1071.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2009
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 583.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
To Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|